Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tiffany F Jacobs, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Caffrey, Daniel J., against Charles C. Tracy, represented by Bushway, Todd Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Sara Sheldon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSara Sheldon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management64 days |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time843 days |
ANSWER
Date: August 18, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled Sheldon (Court Activity) Judge: Sheldon, Hon. Sara |
|
June 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Benedict (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
March 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Benedict (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
September 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Benedict (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
March 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Reassignment Kloch (Court Activity) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
September 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Winter (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Charles Tracy |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.