Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Niagara Bank, N.A.,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ruuska, Ryan E, against Citibank, First Niagara Bank, Matt Clark, Shawn M Maines Aka Shawn Marie Maines, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Sara Sheldon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSara Sheldon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: September 14, 2017EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: September 14, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 22, 2016ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1)
Date: September 01, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 27, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: October 12, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) Notice of Entry with copy of Filed/granted Order |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3) | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Order |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Support of Discontinuance & Cancellation of Notice of Pendency |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1) | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Ex-Parte Order of Reference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.