Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chase Home Finance Llc, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Broyles, Mark K., Case, David P, Stiene, Charles, against China Ewing, Curtis Ewing, Estate Of Curtis Ewing, Frederica Ewing, Fredericka Ewing, (total of 8) See All represented by Fleming, Mary Enright, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions882 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time882 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: September 12, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: March 09, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: September 12, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: March 09, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)
Date: December 13, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: December 13, 2017ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #2)
Date: January 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #3)
Date: March 09, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: May 18, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 05, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 30, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 18, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 13, 2016ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: October 23, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) AFF OF NOTICE OF SALE |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) AFF OF POSTING |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) AFF OF PUBLICATION |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) TERMS OF SALE AND MEMORANDUM OF SALE |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE (Motion #3) REFEREES REPORT OF SALE |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE (Motion #3) REFEREE'S SURPLUS MONIES FORM |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.