Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rakela S Streeter, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Peterson, Cherie Lynn, against Darin Anthony Mort, Debra S Mort, represented by Archilla, Daniel Richard, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph A Boniello Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2015 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 28, 2018ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: May 17, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 15, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 15, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: January 16, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: January 16, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) Attorney Affirmation |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFF RAKELA STREETER AND AFFIXING AN ATTORNEY'S LIEN FOR FEES & DI |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Compel Discovery |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Scheduling Order |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Plaintiff's partial discovery responses |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) RJI |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Second good faith letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.