Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
At&T Communications Of New York, Inc., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Wassel, Thomas B, against The Assessor Of The City Of Niagara Falls, The Board Of Assessment Review Of The City Of Niagara Falls And The City Of Niagara Falls, represented by Odonnell, Thomas Michael, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management32 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2015 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time207 days |
ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT
Date: March 04, 2016PETITION
Date: July 09, 2015STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: March 04, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Boniello, III (Motion Part) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT | |
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
March 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Boniello, III (Motion Part) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
February 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Boniello, III (Motion Part) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
February 24, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 03/04/2016Decided Before Justice: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
February 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled Boniello, III (Court Activity) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
December 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Held Boniello, III (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
November 18, 2015 | Hearing |
Held Fiorella (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
October 01, 2015 | Hearing |
Held Fiorella (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.