Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
John Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Merson, Jordan, Rutsky, Jordan Kyle, against Archdiocese Of New York, Holy Child Church, Holy Child School Of Religion, Morgan Kuhl, represented by Gallagher, Shannon P., Loveless, John J A M, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Alexander M. Tisch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlexander M. Tisch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 12, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: December 07, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: December 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 31, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: August 31, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: August 31, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 09, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: August 31, 2021ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION)
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 14, 2021ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION)
Date: July 10, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 11, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: May 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 16, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 16, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 12, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2022 |
ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION) Second Amended Confidentiality Order July 6, 2022. |
||
May 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
December 16, 2021 |
ANSWER Verified Answer Holy Child Church and Holy Child School of Religion |
||
December 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
December 07, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION STANDARD AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURES DIRECTED AT PLAINTIFF |
||
December 07, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION COMMON DEMAND FOR VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS DIRECTED AT PLAINTIFF |
||
December 07, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION STANDARD COMBINED DEMANDS DIRECTED AT PLAINTIFF |
||
November 11, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
November 09, 2021 |
ANSWER Verified Answer |
||
November 09, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Deposition Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.