Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ark175 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Anderson, Jeffrey Robert, Goffe, Trusha Patel, Shaikh, Nahid Aftab, against Archdiocese Of New York, Does 1-5 Whose Identities Are Unknown To Plaintiff, Sacred Heart Of Jesus, represented by Aubel, John Thomas, Filiberti, Joanne, Harrington, Peter F, Harwood, Jonathan R, Jaffery, Ali R., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with George J. Silver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge J. Silver Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ANSWER
Date: August 31, 2020ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: October 14, 2020ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION)
Date: April 05, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 28, 2020ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION)
Date: July 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: April 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 12, 2020ANSWER
Date: September 28, 2020ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: September 18, 2020ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 23, 2020ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 23, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: June 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2022 |
ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION) Second Amended Confidentiality Order July 6, 2022. |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants) |
||
August 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs) |
||
April 16, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Order Concerning Liaison Counsel for NYC - Hon. George J. Silver |
||
April 05, 2021 |
ORDER - AMENDED (NON-MOTION) CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Hon. George J. Silver |
||
October 14, 2020 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Hon. George J. Silver (Directing Master Index Number) |
||
September 28, 2020 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
September 28, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
September 18, 2020 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Hon. George J. Silver |
||
August 31, 2020 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.