Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wells Fargo Financial Credit Services New York, Inc. v. Corazon Tamargo-Rivera, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. As Successor By Merger To Wells Fargo Financial Bank, United States Of America Acting Through The Irs, Board Of Managers Of The Ile St. Louis Cond…
On November 14, 2016 a real property - mortgage foreclosure - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Francis A. Kahn Iii presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 14, 2016
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Silver, George;Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Bankruptcy
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 004) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due
Date: Jan 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Jan 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Jan 20, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion 004) Loan Statement
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Jan 17, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: Jan 09, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Oct 31, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: Oct 25, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Oct 20, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Sep 01, 2022DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Aug 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Aug 16, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Jul 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Jul 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jul 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Jul 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 003)
Date: Jul 27, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: Jul 15, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: Apr 27, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: Mar 01, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: Jan 24, 2022HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: Apr 01, 2021URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: Mar 19, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 07, 2019DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Nov 04, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT - (Motion 002)
Date: Nov 04, 2019NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Oct 02, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Jun 21, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: May 06, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 002)
Date: May 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 002)
Date: May 06, 2019AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: May 06, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Feb 13, 2019DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Jan 09, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: Jun 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: Jun 07, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 07, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: Apr 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 23, 2018ADMISSION OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 23, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Mar 22, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion 001)
Date: Mar 21, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Feb 28, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Feb 28, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: Feb 28, 2018AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: Feb 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - A-Q (Motion 001) Exhibits A-Q Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Feb 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: Feb 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Feb 26, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Jan 30, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Jan 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 05, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 05, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: Aug 22, 2017ANSWER
Date: Jan 19, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jan 11, 2017RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: Dec 29, 2016ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: Dec 29, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 16, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 13, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 08, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 05, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 05, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 05, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 01, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 29, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Nov 29, 2016SUMMONS COMPLAINT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 14, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 14, 2016NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 14, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #004) Notice of Withdrawal |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Summons and Complaint |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Department of Defense Search results |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #004) Bankruptcy Order to Dismiss Case |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Certificate of Merit |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #004) Affidavits of Service of the Summons, per CPLR 3215 |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Notices of Pendency |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #004) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 20, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 20, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) Affidavits of Service |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #004) Notice of Entry of Summary Judgment and Order of Reference |
||
January 20, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) | ||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #004) Attorney Fee Affirmation |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #004) Covid-19 Hardship Declaration |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #004) Affirmation of Regularity |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #004) Merger Documentation |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #004) Summary Judgment and Order of Reference |
||
January 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #004) Referee's Oath and Report of Amount Due |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #004) Conference Affirmation |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #004) Loan Statement Loan Statement Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #004) Notices of Appearance |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #004) Answer |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #004) HUD Settlement Statement |
||
January 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #004) Decision and Order appointing a Substitute Referee |
||
January 17, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR non military affidavit Redacted |
||
January 09, 2023 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
October 31, 2022 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
October 25, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
October 20, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 18, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 16, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter |
||
July 27, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Order |
||
July 27, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 27, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Defendant filed bankruptcy |
||
July 15, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
April 27, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
March 01, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
January 24, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
April 01, 2021 | HARDSHIP DECLARATION | ||
February 02, 2021 | hearing |
IAS PART 10 CONTROL DATE Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
November 10, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PART 10 9:30A.M. 111 CENTRE STREET,RM.1227 Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
September 08, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PART 10 9:30A.M. 111 CENTRE STREET,RM.1227 Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
August 04, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PART 10 9:30A.M. 111 CENTRE STREET,RM.1227 Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
May 26, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PART 10 9:30A.M. 111 CENTRE STREET,RM.1227 Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
January 14, 2020 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 10 9:30A.M. 111 CENTRE STREET,RM.1227 Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT - (Motion #002) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Substitute Referee |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
July 09, 2019 | hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 10 AFTER ARG Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
July 09, 2019 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 10 AWAITING MOTION DECISION Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
June 17, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 9:30AM ORAL ARG Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
May 28, 2019 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 10 9:30A.M. 111 CENTRE STREET,RM.1227 Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
May 22, 2019 | Motion |
APPT REF COMPUTE/EXAMINE ACCT. (Motion #002) Decided: 11/01/2019MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: SILVER, GEORGE J. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Said correspondence |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) A copy of the order |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | |
March 26, 2019 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 10 9:30A.M. 111 CENTRE STREET Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
July 31, 2018 | hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 10 AFTER ARG Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
July 31, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 10 AWAITING MOTION DECISION Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
June 19, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 10 9:30A.M. 111 CENTRE STREET Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
June 15, 2018 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) ADJOURNED FOR WORKING COPIES 9;30AM ORAL ARG Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
June 11, 2018 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR MOT Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 30, 2018 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgement |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
ADMISSION OF SERVICE (Motion #001) 850218-16 - Afd of Mailing - Opp to Motion for Summ Jdg |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Verified Answer |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Mortgage Note |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgement |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint |
|
March 28, 2018 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR SOS Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001) Stipulation to Adjourn Return date of Motion 1 |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-Q (Motion #001) Exhibits A-Q Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibits A-Q Redacted |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 28, 2018 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 01/08/2019SEE DECISION Before Justice: SILVER, GEORGE J. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR Non-Military Affidavit Redacted |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Appearance |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
July 26, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:15 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
June 14, 2017 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:15 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
June 07, 2017 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:15 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
May 24, 2017 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:15 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
May 10, 2017 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:15 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
March 22, 2017 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:15 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
February 22, 2017 | hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:15 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BOARD OF MANAGERS OF THE ILE ST. LOUIS CONDOMINIUM |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - BONA TIERRA REAL ESTATE SUED HEREIN AS JOHN DOE 1 |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING - CORAZON TAMARGO-RIVERA |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - CORAZON TAMARGO-RIVERA |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR TAMARGO-RIVERA |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS FOR TAMARGO-RIVERA |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |