Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Broyles, Mark K., Case, David P, against Board Of Managers Of Academy Twins Condominium, John Doe And Jane Doe, Nandanie Sabajo, As Executrix Of The Estate Of Jane E. Hera A K A Jane Hera, Deceased, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, United States Of America, (total of 5) See All represented by Zebrowski, Kathleen A, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Tanya Kennedy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time222 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 28, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 23, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 27, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 12, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 01, 2014NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: February 28, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 01, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 01, 2014RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 01, 2014NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 30, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 01, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 01, 2014NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 10, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2014 |
ORDER - OTHER Re: Appearance #007, OTHER ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 23, 2014 |
||
October 08, 2014 | Hearing |
FSC - DISCONTINUED (U) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART Judge: KENNEDY, TANYA R. |
|
September 10, 2014 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 30, 2014 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:30 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
June 25, 2014 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:30 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
May 01, 2014 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 01, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JANE DOE AS DOE |
||
May 01, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BOARD OF MANAGERS ACADEMY TWINS |
||
May 01, 2014 |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI |
||
May 01, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF NON MIL NANDANIE SABAJO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.