Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Federal National Mortgage Association Fannie Mae A Corporation Organized And Existing Under The Laws Of The United States Of America, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against City Of New York Environmental Control Board, City Of New York Parking Violations Bureau, City Of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau, Elsie Jimenez A K A Elsie L. Jimenez, John Doe Said Name Being Fictitious It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein And Any Parties Corporations Or Entities If Any Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, (total of 7) See All represented by Ross, Karen M., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Rmf Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRmf Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time189 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 12, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 12, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 10, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2017 | Hearing |
FSC - DISCONTINUED (U) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:15 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
July 12, 2017 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 12, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Schedule B - Notice of Appearance |
||
July 12, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Schedule A - Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR Schedule A - Affidavits of Service Redacted |
||
July 12, 2017 |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Stipulation Canceling Lis Pendens and Affirmation |
||
June 07, 2017 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE PART 2:15 PM Judge: RES MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE JUDGE |
|
May 05, 2017 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Additional Notice of Pendency |
||
May 03, 2017 | Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons | ||
April 21, 2017 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-ELISE JIMENEZ |
||
April 14, 2017 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.