Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Board Of Directors Of The Manhattan Club Timeshare Association Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pappas, Shaun William, Roschelle, Andrea L., against Roy Paul Winkworth, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Non-Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time548 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 28, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 31, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization re ECF |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service re Notice of Discontinuance | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Discontinuance |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization re ECF |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Firm Address |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service re Notice of Discontinuance | |
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Discontinuance |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Pursuant to CPLR 3215 | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service re Return Receipt Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.