Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Robert Peck, Shari Sveningson, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Colman, Ariella M., Silver, Perry David, against Maurice Rachko M.D., Mount Sinai Doctors, Mount Sinai Medical Center A K A Mount Sinai Health System, Susie Chung, M.D., P.C., represented by Kelton, David G., Kennedy, Kaitlin Marie, Ryan, Michael Paul, Viuker, Barry M., Wishner, Corey Lee, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with John J. Kelley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a medical malpractice and negligence, and lack of informed consent lawsuit. The plaintiffs are Robert Peck and Shari Sveningson. The defendants are Susie Chung, Maurice Rachko, Mount Sinai Doctors, and Mount Sinai Medical Center a/k/a Mount S...
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 25, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 02, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*
Date: April 24, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 01, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 14, 2024NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: February 21, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: February 21, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 15, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 04, 2024ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 04, 2024DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 30, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 30, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 04, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 30, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 28, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 09, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2023SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: October 17, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 09, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 01, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations on behalf of Defendants Rachko, Mount Sinai Doctors and Mount Sinai Hospital |
||
April 25, 2024 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | ||
April 24, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected* | ||
March 14, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations for Additional Medical Records |
||
February 21, 2024 | NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE | ||
February 21, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE | ||
February 21, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 15, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR: Initial Combined Demands - MAURICE RACHKO/MS HOSPITAL/ICAHN SCHOOL OF MEDICINE @ MOUNT SINAI |
||
January 04, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR: Expert Demand 3101(d)(1) - ICAHN SCHOOL OF MEDICINE @ MOUNT SINAI s/h/a MOUNT SINAI DOCTORS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.