Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Christopher Tucker, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Wisell, John T, against Edwin P. Su, Hospital For Special Surgery, Mark P. Figgie, represented by Rikhye, Bhalinder L, Schoenman, Edward M., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Judy Harris Kluger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 18, 2013 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time503 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 18, 2013RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: July 24, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2013CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 22, 2013NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: July 24, 2013STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 02, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 03, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 22, 2013ANSWER
Date: May 30, 2013ANSWER
Date: May 30, 2013ANSWER
Date: May 30, 2013DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 30, 2013DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 30, 2013DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Notice of Substitution and Consent to Change Attorney |
|
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
November 21, 2013 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) 38 MED MAL SETTLEMENT PROGRAM 2:15P.M. Judge: KLUGER, JUDY H. |
|
October 17, 2013 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD 38 MED MAL SETTLEMENT PROGRAM 2:15P.M. Judge: KLUGER, JUDY H. |
|
October 03, 2013 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED 38 MED MAL SETTLEMENT PROGRAM 2:15P.M. Judge: KLUGER, JUDY H. |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #001, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Augus Re: Appearance #001, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Augus ... show more |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #001, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Augus Re: Appearance #001, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Augus ... show more |
|
August 01, 2013 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD 38 MED MAL SETTLEMENT PROGRAM 2:15P.M. Judge: KLUGER, JUDY H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.