Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Paula Magana, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Lugo, Betty, Ronemus, Michael B, against Avraham Schlager M.D., David M. Poppers M.D., Dr. E. Ross, Kenneth Rifkind M.D., New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, (total of 7) See All represented by Canosa, Claudia Laura, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Judy Harris Kluger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 08, 2012 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time539 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 09, 2013LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: October 09, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2013STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 30, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: November 18, 2013DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 18, 2012COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: August 03, 2012STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 15, 2013SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: September 13, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2012STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 22, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2013DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 29, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 29, 2013 |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.