Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gloria Jachero, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Verchick, Glenn, against John Doe, New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, Simon Nzuzi Dpm, represented by Pierre, Nicole, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Judy Harris Kluger presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 16, 2012 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time653 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 16, 2012LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: November 27, 2013STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 25, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 08, 2012STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 04, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 30, 2012STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 28, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Re: Appearance #003, SO ORDERED LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on N |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #005, COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on August |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #004, COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 30 |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Re: Appearance #003, SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 25, |
|
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER OTHER ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 30, 2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.