Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dorothy Quintero, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Ronemus, Michael B, against Dr. Dugan, Scott Belsley M.D., St Lukes Roosevelt Hospital, represented by Bartlett, Kevin John, Lewis, Garrett Patrick, O'Sullivan, John Patrick, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Joan B Lobis presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management104 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2014 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time510 days |
ANSWER
Date: February 10, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 13, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: January 15, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 15, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 10, 2014DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 10, 2014DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 10, 2014DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 10, 2014DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 10, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance obo St. Luke's-Roosevelt Hospital Center |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 17, 2015 | |
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) As against defendant, Scott Belsley |
|
June 09, 2015 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) STATUS CONFERENCE 6 10:00 SETTLED 3MIL Judge: LOBIS, JOAN B. |
|
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #004, STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 18, |
|
March 17, 2015 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 6 Judge: LOBIS, JOAN B. |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #004, STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 1 |
|
December 09, 2014 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 6 Judge: LOBIS, JOAN B. |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #002, COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Septem |
|
September 09, 2014 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 6 Judge: LOBIS, JOAN B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.