Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
As The Administratrix Of The Estate Of, Lamont Bolden , Deceased,, Rhonda Bolden, Rhonda Bolden Individually, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Hartman, Justin Richard, Krentsel, Steven, against Benjamin Kliot Md, Beth Israel Medical Center, Christina Tran Md, Clarisse J. Glen Md, Daniel Goldstein Md, (total of 10) See All represented by Baum, Melissa Lauren, Goldstein, Lisa Beth, Kelton, David G., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with George J. Silver presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management266 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2014 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time546 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: July 01, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: September 04, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: July 01, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: November 27, 2015ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #003)
Date: January 04, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 04, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: November 27, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: July 02, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 15, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 05, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 02, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #003) | |
December 17, 2015 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 10EFM 9:30AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
November 30, 2015 | Motion |
MODIFY ORDER/JUDGMENT (Motion #003) Decided: 01/04/2016SEE DECISION Before Justice: SILVER, GEORGE J. Answer demanded: No Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
November 27, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) | |
November 27, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) | |
November 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003) Proposed Order (Amending Prior Order dated 11/24/15) |
|
November 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) Correspondence from NYC Human Resources Administration dated 4/1/15 |
|
November 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) Attorney Affirmation |
|
November 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Order dated 11/24/15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.