Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kawasi Asante-Tannor, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Fitzpatrick, Kelly Ann, Fuchsberg, Eli Avery, against Barry M. Rosenthal M.D., Betty Chia-Wen Chang M.D., New York Presbyterian Hospital Columbia University Medical Center, Winthrop University Hospital, represented by Deaner, Alison Gayle, Elliott, Robert Frank, Mandell, Steven C., Meister, Jonathan Alan, Samuels, Kerona, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with George J. Silver presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2014 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1001 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1001 days |
NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 28, 2016REMITTITUR
Date: February 20, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: April 15, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 15, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 15, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 09, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: October 03, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 09, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: May 01, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 30, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: May 16, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2016ANSWER
Date: February 18, 2014DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 18, 2014DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 18, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 03, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: September 29, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 15, 2016DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 29, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 05, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: March 19, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 18, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 04, 2016DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 18, 2014DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 18, 2014ANSWER
Date: February 18, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 18, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 29, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: September 11, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE |
|
November 30, 2016 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL JUDICIAL MEDIATION 9:30AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
November 22, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED JUDICIAL MEDIATION 2:15P.M. Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
November 02, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED JUDICIAL MEDIATION 2:15PM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal, Pre-Argument Statement & Exhibit | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) Notice of Entry |
|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.