Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Moses & Singer Llp, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Baranello, John V, against Tara Kulukundis, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn R Kotler Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time77 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 19, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 21, 2020PETITION
Date: December 19, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: December 19, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: March 05, 2020NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001)
Date: December 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
January 08, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.