Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Mark Convery On Behalf Of Himself And All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Campisi, Jeffrey Philip, against Alioune Ndiaye, Andre T. Iguodala, Angela Kaya Mwanza, Antoine Maillet-Mezeray, Berenberg Capital Markets, Llc, (total of 21) See All represented by Malkina, Julia A., Marooney, Richard T, Martin, Christina Alicia, Rein, David Maxwell James, Rosenberg, Jonathan, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with Andrea Masley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a class action securities lawsuit on behalf of purchasers of ADSs of Jumia Technologies AG (“Jumia” or the “Company”), a pan-African e-commerce platform, pursuant and/or traceable to the Registration Statement issued in connection with the Co...
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIRMATION (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 09, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 05, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 23, 2020TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS (Motion #001)
Date: March 13, 2020ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: January 05, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: October 09, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 23, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 22, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: March 13, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002)
Date: October 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002)
Date: October 09, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 27, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 09, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 12, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 09, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 13, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 12, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 09, 2020SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 05, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001)
Date: May 05, 2020URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 20, 2020NOTICE
Date: March 13, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 22, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: February 06, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 16, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 16, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 16, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 12, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 12, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 01, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 01, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2019ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: October 17, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: October 17, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003)
Date: April 14, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 07, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: April 13, 2022ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED) (Motion #004)
Date: March 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) *Corrected*
Date: February 17, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003)
Date: April 14, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003)
Date: April 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003)
Date: April 14, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: March 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003)
Date: April 14, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021AFFIRMATION (Motion #003)
Date: March 11, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Motion #003)
Date: April 01, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: March 11, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: March 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) | ||
March 29, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED) (Motion #004) | ||
February 17, 2022 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FUND |
||
February 17, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) *Corrected* NOTICE OF MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FUND |
||
February 17, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FUNDDISTRIBUTION |
||
February 17, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #004) AFFIDAVIT OF JOSEPHINE BRAVATA CONCERNING THE RESULTS OF THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION PROCESS and EXHIBITS |
||
April 14, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) 1) Order and Final Judgment (NYSCEF No. 91); 2) Order Approving Plan of Allocation (NYSCEF No. 92); 3) Order Awarding Attorneys Fees and Expenses, and Award to State Class Representative (NYSCEF No. 93); and 4) Decision and Order on Motion(NYSCEF No. 90) |
||
April 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) Order Awarding Attorneys Fees and Expenses to State Class Counsel, and Award to State Class Representative, dated April 2, 2021 and entered on April 13, 2021 (NYSCEF No. 93) |
||
April 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003) Decision and Order on Motion, dated and entered on April 7, 2021 (NYSCEF No. 90) |
||
April 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) Order Approving Plan of Allocation, dated April 2, 2021 and entered April 13, 2021 (NYSCEF No. 92) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.