Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Diana Imports Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kleinhendler, Howard, Libou, Jason Louis, Pick, Douglas J, Zabicki, Eric C, against World Marketing Incorporated, represented by Ha, Bryan, Hantman, Robert Jay, Perle, Michael Richard, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Francis A Kahn Iii presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Ucc |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions399 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time399 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: December 18, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: March 01, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: November 27, 2018ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 13, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: January 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: February 14, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 14, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 14, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: February 17, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: December 18, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: December 31, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: January 10, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: April 01, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 11, 2020MEMORANDUM
Date: February 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: February 18, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: February 17, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003)
Date: February 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003)
Date: February 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003)
Date: February 17, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: May 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: May 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #004)
Date: June 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: February 18, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004)
Date: May 19, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #003)
Date: February 24, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: December 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2020 | Hearing |
PD - DISCONTINUED REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 2:00 SEE DOC# 169 Judge: KAHN, FRANCIS A. |
|
November 06, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 32 9:30 AM PER STIP Judge: KAHN, FRANCIS A. |
|
November 06, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 32 9:30 AM PER ORDER Judge: KAHN, FRANCIS A. |
|
November 06, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 32 10AM PER STIP Judge: KAHN, FRANCIS A. |
|
August 26, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 32 9:30 AM PER STIP Judge: KAHN, FRANCIS A. |
|
August 26, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 32 9:30 AM PER ORDER Judge: KAHN, FRANCIS A. |
|
August 26, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 32 10AM PER STIP Judge: KAHN, FRANCIS A. |
|
August 12, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 32 9:30 AM PER STIP Judge: KAHN, FRANCIS A. |
|
August 12, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 32 9:30 AM PER ORDER Judge: KAHN, FRANCIS A. |
|
August 12, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 32 10AM PER STIP Judge: KAHN, FRANCIS A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.