Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lori Bland, Ronald Bland, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Antin, Jeffrey S, Epstein, Scott W, against Architectural Tile & Bath, Inc., Chris Patsis, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Martin Schoenfeld presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 31, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 06, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 26, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #002) IAS MOTION 14 NO APPEARANCE SUBMISSION ONLY Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. |
|
December 21, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 14 NO APPEARANCE SUBMISSION ONLY Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. |
|
November 23, 2020 | Motion |
OTHER RELIEFS (Motion #002) Before Justice: BLUTH, ARLENE P. Answer demanded: No Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. |
|
August 17, 2020 | Motion |
OTHER RELIEFS (Motion #001) Decided: 08/25/2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REFUSED Before Justice: BLUTH, ARLENE P. Answer demanded: No Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. |
|
August 17, 2020 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED OFFICE/FOR REASSIGNING CASE DELETING RESTORATION Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. |
|
January 01, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 14 Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit A transcript |
|
April 04, 2017 | Hearing |
INQUEST HELD IAS TRIAL READY 28 Judge: SCHOENFELD, MARTIN |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of service |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY notice of trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.