Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
John Tarpinian, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Richan, David S, Sparer, Gregory Schaeffer, against Jollene J. Austin, represented by Meissner, Stuart D, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Anil Singh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnil Singh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Cycle Time26 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 29, 2016AFFIRMATION
Date: July 29, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 29, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 29, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 29, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 29, 2016AFFIRMATION
Date: August 03, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 03, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 03, 2016ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: July 29, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 03, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 03, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2016TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: September 01, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 02, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 24, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 03, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 29, 2016RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 29, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 22, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: July 29, 2016PETITION
Date: July 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2016 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 02, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) 8/24/16 Decision Denying Permenent Stay & Transcript So Ordered 9/1/16 |
||
September 01, 2016 | TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED | ||
August 24, 2016 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 24, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 45EFM 2:30PM OSC Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
August 22, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B- Petitioner's Arbitrator Ranking Form and Cover Letter |
||
August 22, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A- Petitioner's FINRA Answer and Cover Letter |
||
August 22, 2016 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
August 19, 2016 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Meissner Affirmation |
||
August 19, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Opposition to Denial of Forum Filed with FINRA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.