Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Duck River Textiles, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Houslanger, Todd E, against Nomorerack.Com, Inc., N K A Choxi.Com, Inc., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Eileen A. Rakower presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 22, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time136 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: December 05, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 06, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 22, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 06, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 06, 2016AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2016BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2016BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED)
Date: September 30, 2016AFFIRMATION
Date: September 30, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 22, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #001) JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK |
|
November 29, 2016 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 12/01/2016CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. Answer demanded: No Judge: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. |
|
November 29, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001) Affidavit of Facts by Plaintiff |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) Bill of Costs |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order Granting Judgment |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Default Judgment |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.