Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Darrick Stephens P K A Devyne Stephens, Upfront Megatainment, Inc. F K A Upfront Entertainment, Inc., filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Movit, Jeffrey Mark, against Manson Johnson Conner Pllc, Napoli Shkolnik, Pllc, represented by Bustamante, Brett Scott, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Arthur F. Engoron presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArthur F. Engoron Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-PETITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 11, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: August 02, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - NA Petition with exhibits
Date: August 02, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 02, 2023PETITION
Date: August 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Decision in HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL, LLC V. ALBEMARLE CORPORATION, |
||
September 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) 4B N.Y.Prac., Com. Litig. in New York State Courts 61:24 (5th ed.) |
||
September 26, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation in Further Support of Petition |
||
September 20, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Strike |
||
September 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Petitioners' Document Entitled "Notice of Cross-Petition" |
||
September 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Affirmation of Jeffrey M. Movit in Support of Motion to Strike Or Dismiss |
||
September 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion to Strike or Dismiss Respondents' Document Entitled "Notice of Cross-Petition" |
||
August 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) Cross-Respondents letter to modify Final Award and administrative correspondence |
||
August 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Cross-Respondents Motion to Dismiss et al. |
||
August 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Cross-Respondents Fee Application and Cross-Peitioners Objection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.