Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Ohio Loan Co., Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cohn, Jonathan, against Luxefindz, Llc, Xxxxxxx Xxxxxxxx, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a summons and verified complaint filed by OHIO LOAN CO., INC., a corporation domiciled in Ohio, against LUXEFINDZ, LLC and xxxxxxx xxxxxxxx, defendants, regarding a final judgment entered in Ohio in favor of the plaintiff and against the defe...
BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED)
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: April 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 26, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 26, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: February 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 26, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 26, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION *Corrected*
Date: February 26, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: September 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 24, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 24, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 | Affirmation of Service of Notice of Motion | ||
March 19, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Service |
||
February 26, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 26, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION Atty. Affirmation in Support of Motion |
||
February 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint and Ohio Judgment |
||
February 26, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
February 26, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION *Corrected* | ||
October 18, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) | ||
October 18, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.