Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
444 Park Avenue South Associates Llc, A & L 444 Llc, David Moinian, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Matlin, Julia Fallon, Trotter, Richard Walker, against Ankura Trust Company, Llc, Feoh Capital, Llc, Royal Abstract Of New York Llc, represented by Dewitt, John Paul, Haims, Joel Charles, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Robert R. Reed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint alleges conspiracy and bad faith by the defendants, who are involved in a real estate transaction in which the plaintiffs are the borrowers and one of the defendants, Feoh, is the lender. The borrowers and the lender entered into an ag...
ORDER - TRANSFER CASE - REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 06, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: July 06, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: July 06, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 07, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: July 12, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | ORDER - TRANSFER CASE - REASSIGNMENT | ||
July 14, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 13, 2023 |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to Court regarding Withdrawal on Consent of Plaintiffs' motion. |
||
July 12, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY | ||
July 11, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) so ordered |
||
July 07, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to The Honorable Lyle E. Frank from Joel C. Haims in response to the Courts request at the Ju Letter to The Honorable Lyle E. Frank from Joel C. Haims in response to the Courts request at the Ju ... show more |
||
July 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A |
||
July 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001) Supplemental Affidavit of David Moinian |
||
July 07, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Email dated July 6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.