Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dematteis Darcon, Joint Venture, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Fernandez Sanchez, Atanasio, Lonigro, John Anthony, Pratt, Ashley Ann, Rosenthal, Michael J, Westermann, David, (total of 5) See All against The City Of New York, represented by Johnson, Gregory C, Lear, Lewis Raphael, New York City Law Department, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Andrea Masley presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management274 days |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
COMPLAINT
Date: May 31, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2016ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: December 29, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 18, 2017ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 06, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 27, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 18, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: February 13, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 24, 2016PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 29, 2016SUMMONS
Date: May 31, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 03, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 29, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: January 23, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: February 24, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 03, 2017AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: March 04, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 04, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: March 29, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 19, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 27, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 24, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: February 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 15, 2019TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: May 23, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 13, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: July 08, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 21, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 10, 2019TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: May 24, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 10, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 07, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 15, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: December 13, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 20, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT
Date: March 16, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: March 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: October 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N-1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N-5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: January 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 16, 2020ORDER - AMENDED
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N-3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 16, 2020TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: February 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N-4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N-2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2D Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2C Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 30, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: January 16, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2A Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 16, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 11, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 06, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2B Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-A Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-B Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004) Turner Cost Analyses
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 17, 2021ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: April 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: March 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021SUR-REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 06, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: September 22, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 10, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 26, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 17, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: August 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 30, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 04, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: June 03, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: May 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 06, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: November 16, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 17, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: December 22, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: January 03, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: December 28, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 02, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: February 06, 2023STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 05, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 12, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: March 22, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 09, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 19, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 30, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 27, 2017STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: January 19, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: June 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
May 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #006) Turner/FTR Executive Summary |
||
May 25, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
May 16, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to JHO Ramos re: Privilege Dispute |
||
May 10, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Plaintiff's Letter to JHO Ramos Re: Discovery Dispute |
||
May 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #006) Executive Summary of Expert Report of Eric Schatz |
||
May 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #006) Exhibit 6 to the Deposition of Francoise Fortune-Blanchard |
||
May 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #006) Fortune-Blanchard Deposition Excerpts |
||
May 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #006) Brue Deposition Excerpts |
||
May 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Registered Change Order 45 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.