Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Second 820 Owner Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Grill, David M, Schieber, Evan R, against Kaa Imports, Inc., represented by Chatrath, Sandeep, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Louis L. Nock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLouis L. Nock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 15, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 14, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 03, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 15, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 28, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 15, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 15, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 04, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 15, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 03, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 11, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Without Prejudice |
||
August 30, 2021 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) Stipulation adjourning motion to 10/11/2021 |
||
August 04, 2021 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) Stipulation adjourning motion to 09/20/2021 |
||
July 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Complaint |
||
July 15, 2021 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
July 15, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Rent Ledger |
||
July 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.