Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Esrt 1333 Broadway, L.L.C., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Eyland, Jessica, Frieman, Karen S, against Urban Outfitters, Inc., represented by Giller, Ronald A, Mahoney, Kasey Theresa, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Andrew S Borrok presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 13, 2020ANSWER
Date: July 17, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Notice of Neutral Evaluation Program - Commercial Division - Supreme NY Civil |
||
August 13, 2020 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
August 11, 2020 |
ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) Commercial Division Addendum |
||
July 24, 2020 | ANSWER (AMENDED) | ||
July 24, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 17, 2020 | answer | ||
July 17, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service |
||
July 17, 2020 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
June 18, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 05, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.