Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
The Board Of Managers Of 229 East 2Nd Street Condominium, As Agent For The Unit Owners, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Colbert, Joseph George, against Queenie Y. Cheng-Clemente, represented by Mandel Clemente, Linda A., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Condominium Arrears) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeCondominium |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: November 16, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: November 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: November 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: November 20, 2020CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 05, 2020SUMMONS
Date: June 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 10, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
November 21, 2020 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of Deposition of Defendant |
||
November 20, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
November 20, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Correspondence sent by counsel for Defendant Clemente |
||
November 20, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Correspondence sent by counsel for Defendant Clemente |
||
November 20, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Correspondence sent by counsel for Defendant Clemente |
||
November 20, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Correspondence sent by counsel for Defendant Clemente |
||
November 20, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Correspondence sent by counsel for Plaintiff |
||
November 16, 2020 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
October 30, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service of Summons, Complaint and Notice of E-Filing on Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.