Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Global Horizion Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Storobin, David, against Prestige Trucking Global Llc, Steven Badru, represented by Siegel, Barry Ira, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Gerald Lebovits presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald Lebovits Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 01, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 16, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 27, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 11, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 01, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Merchant Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 13, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: July 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 21, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: May 23, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 23, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 13, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 13, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Contract between the Parties
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 13, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: June 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2023AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 11, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 27, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter Brief addressing Rule of Professional Conduct 3.7 |
||
September 11, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter Brief |
||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) DR 5-102 |
||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Rule 3.7 |
||
September 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Ethics Article |
||
July 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Defendant's March 2023 Bank Statement |
||
July 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Kodiak Funding, LLC v. Golden Hosp'y LLC |
||
July 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Email between Plaintiff and Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.