Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Allied Cleaning Services, Inc., Guardian Building Services, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Halpern, Philip M, Hochberg, Shari B., Nicolay, Harry Joseph, against Christopher Doody, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, Kkr Capital Markets Holdings L.P. A K A Kohlberg Kravis & Roberts, Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Co., Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Co., L.P. A K A Kohlberg Kravis & Roberts, (total of 5) See All represented by Griffin, James Michael, Tabak, Daniel H, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with O. Peter Sherwood Req presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeO. Peter Sherwood Req Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time389 days |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 12, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 14, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: August 18, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 14, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: September 26, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 08, 2018ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: December 12, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 03, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: October 03, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: September 19, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: September 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 12, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 15, 2017RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 15, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: August 15, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: August 15, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 15, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: August 13, 2017STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 31, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2018 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF MOTION IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 49 10:30AM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
May 14, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 49EFM 3:30PM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
May 14, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 49EFM 3:30PM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
May 14, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 49EFM 3:30PM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
May 14, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 49EFM 3:30PM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
May 08, 2018 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 49 10:30AM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 01, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 49EFM 3:00PM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.