Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Opus Recruitment Solutions (Usa) Inc. v. 6d Global Technologies, Inc.
On March 10, 2020 a commercial - contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Laurence L. Love presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 10, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Kennedy, Tanya;Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Default Judgment
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
1. BREACH OF CONTRACT
2. UNJUST ENRICHMENT
trialon each Cause of Action;
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Feb 03, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: Dec 21, 2020ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: Nov 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 09, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 09, 2020DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 20, 2020DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Oct 19, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Oct 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 08, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: Aug 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 002)
Date: Aug 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 002)
Date: Aug 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Aug 24, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Aug 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 10, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 29, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: May 29, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: May 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: May 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 001)
Date: May 29, 2020AFFIRMATION (Motion 001)
Date: May 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: May 29, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: May 29, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Mar 11, 2020SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: Mar 10, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 21, 2020 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
November 30, 2020 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
November 09, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Complaint |
||
November 09, 2020 | COMPLAINT | ||
October 20, 2020 | DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT | ||
October 19, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 19, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 15, 2020 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE Judge: LOVE, LAURENCE L. |
|
October 13, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation of Edward S. Feldman |
||
October 08, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Matthew D. Wagoner in Further Support of Motion for Default Judgment |
||
October 08, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Affirmation of Alison Coates-Howard in Further Support of Motion for Default Judgment |
||
October 08, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) 20180619 Harris Email to Opus |
||
October 05, 2020 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR NOP PEND REASSIGNMENT Judge: LOVE, LAURENCE L. |
|
September 10, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE STIP Judge: KENNEDY, TANYA R. |
|
September 03, 2020 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002) Adjourn return date to Oct. 15 - opposition by Oct 8 - Reply by Oct 14 |
||
August 24, 2020 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
August 24, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Default Notice and Affidavit of Service |
||
August 24, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons with Notice and Affidavits of service |
||
August 24, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 24, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
August 24, 2020 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 24, 2020 | Motion |
VACATE STAY/ORDER/JUDGMENT (Motion #002) Decided: 10/19/2020SEE DECISION Before Justice: LOVE, LAURENCE L. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: LOVE, LAURENCE L. |
|
June 30, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR NOP PEND REASSIGNMENT Judge: KENNEDY, TANYA R. |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service on DOS |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Default Judgment |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order For Default Judgment |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service (DOS) |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service (CPLR Notice) |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Matthew D. Wagoner, Esq. in Support of Default Motion |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) CPLR Notice |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons with Notice |
|
May 29, 2020 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 10/19/2020SEE DECISION Before Justice: LOVE, LAURENCE L. Answer demanded: No Judge: LOVE, LAURENCE L. |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |