Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Maurice R. Kassimir As Trustee Of The Gabriel Leventhal Revocable Trust As Amended And Restated On March 14, 1996, And Of Other Trusts Created Thereunder, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Freiberg, Jay Warren, against Bruce Leventhal, Stuart Leventhal, represented by Graff, David, Silverstein, Matthew Jordan, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Marcy Friedman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 19, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2020MEMORANDUM
Date: July 09, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #003) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE Judge: FRIEDMAN, MARCY S. |
|
December 03, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #002) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE Judge: FRIEDMAN, MARCY S. |
|
November 17, 2020 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #003) Before Justice: FRIEDMAN, MARCY S. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: FRIEDMAN, MARCY S. |
|
October 05, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE FOR REVIEW Judge: FRIEDMAN, MARCY S. |
|
October 05, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) IAS MOTION 60 FOR REVIEW Judge: FRIEDMAN, MARCY S. |
|
September 08, 2020 | Motion |
STAY PROCEEDINGS (Motion #002) Before Justice: FRIEDMAN, MARCY S. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: FRIEDMAN, MARCY S. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: FRIEDMAN, MARCY S. |
|
July 16, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR FULLY BRIEFED Judge: FRIEDMAN, MARCY S. |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.