Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hereford Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Schreiber, Harlan R, against 21 Century Chiropractic Care, Arte Medical Primary Care, P.C., Arthur Avenue Medical Office, P.C., Azcare Inc., Bridges Psychological Services P.C., (total of 30) See All represented by Kroopnick, Michael Ian, Rybak, Oleg, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Melissa Anne Crane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 07, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 23, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 03, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 12, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 29, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 14, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: January 22, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: January 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: January 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS for Order and Judgment with Notice of Entry |
||
August 24, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order and Judgment with Notice of Entry |
||
August 23, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Discon for Brioso and 21 Chiro |
||
August 12, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) WJW Medical Products ONLY |
||
July 14, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
June 03, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order |
||
February 04, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #001) Stip partially withdrawing motion |
||
February 04, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discon (Rybak Defendants) |
||
January 29, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #001) Adjournment of Plaintiff's Motion and Defendants' Cross-Motion |
||
January 22, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.