Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Serge Wroclawski, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Lauchheimer, Aaron B, Pollack, Gayle E, against Fulton Landing, Inc., represented by Rosen, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Morrison Cohen LLP represents Serge Wroclawski in this arbitration proceeding against Fulton Landing, Inc. (FLI). Wroclawski contracted with FLI, which was solely owned by Kent Wadhams, for a gut renovation of his home. The contract included a provis...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 20, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 20, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 26, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: March 08, 2022DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 26, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected*
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: March 08, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: March 08, 2022PETITION *Corrected*
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 *Corrected*
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 31, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | ||
August 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Transcript of Proceedings-held May 16, 2022 before Judge Hagler |
||
August 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition to Respondent's Proposed Counter Order and in Further Support of Petitioner's Proposed Order |
||
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Proposed Order |
||
August 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Mark A. Rosen in Support of Counter Order |
||
August 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Proposed Order |
||
August 19, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) Affirmation of Mark A. Rosen, Esq. in Support of Counter Order |
||
June 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) New York State and New York City tax returns |
||
June 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) Payroll reports substantiating the amounts owed to the employees. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.