Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Board Of Managers Of 570 Broome Condominium, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Beck, Michael Stuart, Kelley, Madison Nicole, Paioff, Jared E, Procida, Pamela Parker, against Agime Group, Llc, Erden M Arkan, Erman Agirnasli, Hilmi Ulgur Aydin, Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 10, (total of 10) See All represented by Killelea, Courtney J, Sigmund, Rachel Marie, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Arlene P. Bluth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene P. Bluth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 26, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 31, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 26, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 26, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 22, 2024STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: October 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002) Emails to Opposing Counsel
Date: December 26, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 26, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 30, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 15, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 03, 2023STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 03, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 01, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 26, 2023STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 25, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 30, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 05, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 29, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001) emails Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 15, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (POST RJI)
Date: April 26, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: April 17, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 30, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 29, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 23, 2024 | ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION) | ||
January 22, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 18, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 15, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
December 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #002) Good Faith Demand Letter |
||
December 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #002) Deficiency Letter |
||
December 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) Decision on Motion to Dismiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.