Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Maritech Atm Solutions, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Garbanzos, Isidro Tomas, against Il Bastardo, Sherif Ibrahim, represented by Catafago, Jacques, Sherman, Adam Brad, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time445 days |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 27, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 29, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2019 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
July 27, 2018 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Answer to Bill of Particulars |
||
June 29, 2018 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
May 10, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHERIF IBRAHIM Affidavit of Service |
||
May 10, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE IL BASTARDO Affidavit of Service |
||
April 02, 2018 | ANSWER | ||
February 02, 2018 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.