Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Flat Rate Movers, Ltd., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Travis, Christopher R, against Abid Ali, Adam Berger, Ariel Bornstein, Balquees Ali, Bryan Sanicela, (total of 30) See All represented by Brown, Zavier, David, Michael N., Langweber, Richard Marc, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with SHERWOOD, O presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHERWOOD, O Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Breach Of Fiduciary Duty) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time523 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 11, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 26, 2017ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: February 28, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 17, 2018ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2017ANSWER
Date: February 28, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 10, 2017ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: March 21, 2017ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: April 03, 2017ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: August 29, 2017STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 09, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
July 03, 2018 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 49 9:30AM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Order Discontinuing Action Against Xavier Brown |
|
May 22, 2018 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 49 9:30AM CONTROL/NO APP Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
February 20, 2018 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 49 9:30AM CONTROL Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 16, 2018 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 49 9:30AM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
January 09, 2018 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 49 9:30AM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
November 21, 2017 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 49 10:30AM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
|
October 24, 2017 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 49 10:30AM Judge: SHERWOOD, O. PETER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.