Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Imperial Capital, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Shapiro, Mitchell C, against Delshah 721 Fifth 45K Llc, Delshah Capital, Llc, Law Offices Of Nathaniel B. Smith, Michael Shah, Nathaniel B. Smith Esq., (total of 7) See All represented by Deluca, Lorenzo A, Smith, Nathaniel B, Vlock, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Nancy M. Bannon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial (General) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time121 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: March 07, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 31, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 31, 2014DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 11, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 17, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 31, 2014SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: January 29, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 31, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 31, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 31, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1-5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 31, 2014DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: February 18, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: March 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 17, re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 17, ... show more |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) re: motion no. 002, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 17, re: motion no. 002, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 17, ... show more |
|
May 28, 2014 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 42EFM 9:30AM Judge: BANNON, NANCY M. |
|
May 28, 2014 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 42EFM 9:30AM Judge: BANNON, NANCY M. |
|
May 13, 2014 | Motion |
EXTEND TIME (Motion #001) Decided: 05/30/2014CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: BANNON, NANCY M. Answer demanded: No Judge: BANNON, NANCY M. |
|
May 13, 2014 | Hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (60 CENTRE) (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 9:30AM Judge: BANNON, NANCY M. |
|
May 13, 2014 | Hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (111 CENTRE ST) (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 9:30AM Judge: BANNON, NANCY M. |
|
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | |
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.