Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
640 Realty Llc, 86 Realty Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Grun, Howard, against Fernando Vidal, Viles Contracting Corp., represented by Perlman, Daniel S, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Shirley Werner Kornreich presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial (General) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions378 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time505 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 27, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 29, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 28, 2015JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: February 11, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 06, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 29, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 29, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 14, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2014JUDGMENT
Date: June 18, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment to Clerk with Decision and Bill of Costs |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING (Motion #002) to a JHO or Special Referee to hear and report on attys fees. |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry - Decision on SJM | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on January re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on January ... show more |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Demand Letter re May 2011 |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Verified Answer |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) May 2011 Note |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint and AOS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.