Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ever Bright Realty Corp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Iacoviello, Rocco, against Fashion Apparel Industries, Inc., Judgment Clothing, Inc., Ramin Arasheben, represented by Garbowski, Ivana, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Melissa Anne Crane presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time289 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 14, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 27, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: April 29, 2019ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001)
Date: August 08, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 29, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 16, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: February 13, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: April 29, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 29, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 09, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2019 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED IAS PART 15 10 AM INQUEST ON DAMAGES Judge: CRANE, MELISSA ANNE |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001) | |
August 08, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PART 15 Judge: CRANE, MELISSA ANNE |
|
August 01, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 15 9;30AM ORAL ARG Judge: CRANE, MELISSA ANNE |
|
May 21, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 9;30AM ORAL ARG Judge: CRANE, MELISSA ANNE |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.