Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Sotheby'S, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cossu, Paul Scroppo, against Ying Ming Lin, represented by Heerde, Matthew C, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Nancy Bannon presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management135 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial - Ucc |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time206 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001)
Date: June 14, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: July 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 24, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: June 14, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002)
Date: July 13, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: January 10, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #001)
Date: July 19, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: June 19, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: July 13, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: June 14, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 15, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 03, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: August 01, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: July 14, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 02, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001)
Date: June 14, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 24, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2017 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF MOTION COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 42 9:30AM N/I 12/29/17 Judge: BANNON, NANCY M. |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
August 04, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 42EFM Judge: BANNON, NANCY M. |
|
August 04, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 42EFM Judge: BANNON, NANCY M. |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
August 02, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 42EFM 11:30AM Judge: BANNON, NANCY M. |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001) | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.