Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
The Riverside Premier Rehabilitation & Healing Center, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kern, Kenneth Michael, against Betsy Aridi A K A Betsy Hamlette A K A Betsy Hamlette-Aridi, represented by Mazloumi, Abraham S., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Robert R Reed presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management188 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time419 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 01, 2018ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: July 18, 2017ANSWER
Date: April 17, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT CORRECTION TO PRIOR NOTICE |
||
December 09, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Notice of Neutral Evaluation Program - Commercial Division - Supreme NY Civil |
||
March 05, 2018 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 43 SEE NYSCEF DOC #10 Judge: REED, ROBERT R. |
|
February 01, 2018 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
July 18, 2017 | ORDER - REFERENCE | ||
July 17, 2017 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD PREL CONF - COMM (NON-DIV) Judge: SCARPULLA, SALIANN |
|
June 22, 2017 | NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO ADR | ||
June 21, 2017 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 21, 2017 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
April 17, 2017 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.