Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Edmund Burke, Suzanne D. Burke Individually And On Behalf Of Prnusa, Llc,, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Corona, Nicholas, against Carlos Sobral, represented by Biderman, Eric A, Pepper, Lee Andrew, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Jeffrey Oing presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions224 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time208 days |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #003)
Date: May 10, 2016PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: September 09, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: April 20, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: January 24, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: February 20, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 19, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: February 04, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: March 19, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 06, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: August 28, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: March 04, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: February 03, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003)
Date: April 22, 2016NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: September 09, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: May 02, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #002)
Date: March 20, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: June 12, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #003)
Date: April 20, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: June 10, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: June 10, 2015REMITTITUR
Date: April 10, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: January 30, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: January 30, 2015UNFILED JUDGMENT
Date: August 07, 2014NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: July 22, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 25, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 24, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 19, 2014ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #001)
Date: February 19, 2014RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2014PETITION
Date: January 16, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service Order wth Notice of Entry |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) Order with Notice of Entry |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #003) Order with Notice of Settlement |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
May 06, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 48EFM 10:00AM Judge: OING, JEFFREY K. |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation and Consent Concerning Withdrawal of Counsel |
|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003) | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service by Fedex |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.