Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
American Transit Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Larkin, William Robert, against Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation Pa, Asap Physical Therapy Pc, Health And Comfort Rx Inc, Leurin Baez-Duran, Metropolitan Medical And Surgical Pc, (total of 11) See All represented by Gavrilov, Alina, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Louis Nock presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Breach Of Contract) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time275 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 16, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 04, 2019STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 03, 2019STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 06, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
October 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
October 10, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 38 9;30AM ORAL ARG Judge: NOCK, LOUIS L. |
|
July 31, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 9;30AM ORAL ARG Judge: NOCK, LOUIS L. |
|
July 17, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR PER REF 07/17 Judge: NOCK, LOUIS L. |
|
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 08, 2019 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 10/10/2019CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: NOCK, LOUIS L. Answer demanded: No Judge: NOCK, LOUIS L. |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #001) | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.