Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Jvc Broadcasting Company, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Canales, Jason, against Access.1 Communications Corporation, Hugo Cadelago, Superadio, Llc, represented by Beltre, Samantha E, Oquendo, Ricardo Enrique, Sparber, Neil G, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Shlomo Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial (General) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time460 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 15, 2015RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: August 01, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: September 08, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: April 03, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 15, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 08, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 25, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 24, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: June 25, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: July 03, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: January 17, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: March 25, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: April 03, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: February 14, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: April 15, 2015ANSWER
Date: March 14, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: June 16, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2015 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF MOTION IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 17 Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED SO ORDERED LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 15, 2015 |
|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) re: motion no. 002, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 15 |
|
April 15, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 17 11:00AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
February 02, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 17 Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
February 02, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 17 11:00AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
October 20, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 17 Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
October 20, 2014 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 17 11:00AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002) Stipulation of Adjournment Motion and PC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.