Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Anton Sanko v. Jeffrey Roth
On January 06, 2014 a commercial (general) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Gerald Lebovits presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 06, 2014
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Commercial (General)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Appealed
Case Duration
2 years, 11 months and 16 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: Nov 08, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: Nov 08, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: Dec 22, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Nov 30, 2016PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: Jul 07, 2016DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT (Motion 003)
Date: May 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 003)
Date: Jun 22, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Jun 22, 2015PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: Apr 03, 2015NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL
Date: Apr 03, 2015NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: Apr 02, 2015PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: Apr 02, 2015DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Mar 03, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion 002)
Date: Feb 24, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Feb 19, 2014DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Feb 07, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 002)
Date: Feb 04, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 002)
Date: Feb 04, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Feb 04, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 30, 2014ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 29, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 27, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Jan 27, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Jan 27, 2014ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: Jan 17, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 13, 2014RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 10, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 10, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Jan 10, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 06, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex. A - Judgment with Notice of Entry |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment with Notice of Entry |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE November 30, 2016 Letter from David A. Wolf to Hon. Gerald Lebovits |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Order with Notice of Entry |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT Plaintiff's Pre-Argument Statement |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) You cannot serve notice of entry on a decision/order that has not been entered/filed. |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT (Motion #003) | |
March 30, 2016 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 7EFM 7EFM PER COURT DIRECTIVE Judge: LEBOVITS, GERALD |
|
March 23, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 7 2:30PM PER COURT Judge: LEBOVITS, GERALD |
|
February 03, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 7 9:30AM Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
November 04, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 7 9:30AM Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Jeffrey Roth Affidavit in Opposition to Cross-Motion |
|
August 05, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 9;30 AM Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Roth Email to Wolf |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
|
July 15, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #003) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sj and in Support of Plaintiff |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) Exh. J - our June 3, 2014 letter to Roth memorializing the document requests we made at Roths deposi |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Exh. I - February 3, 2013 e-mail from Ira Mark |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Exh. H - deposition transcript of Jeffrey Roth, taken on May 30, 2014 |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Exh. G - January 10, 2015 affidavit of Anton Sanko |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Exh. F - Supreme Courts March 2, 2015 Decision and Order dismissing Roths counterclaims |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Exh. E - Civil Court Order dismissing Roths lawsuit |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Exh. D - complaint by Roth in the Civil Court |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Exh. C - January 13, 2014 Temporary Restraining Order against Roth |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exh. B - red-lined copy of the proposed amended complaint, tracking the proposed changes |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exh. A - proposed amended complaint |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Opposition to Defendant's Motion and in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #003) Notice of Cross-Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and for Sanctions |
|
June 24, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 7 11:00AM Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) | |
June 22, 2015 | Motion |
DISMISS ACTION (Motion #003) Decided: 05/17/2016CASE DISPOSED/SETTLE ORDER Before Justice: LEBOVITS, GERALD Answer demanded: No Judge: LEBOVITS, GERALD |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Order |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Answer, Defenses, Counterclaims |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Summons and Complaint |
|
April 15, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 7 11:00AM Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order |
|
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Pre-Argument Statement | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Order With Notice Of Entry |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Order with Notice of Entry |
|
March 04, 2015 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 7 11:00AM PER ORDER 3/2/15 Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) re: motion no. 002, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 03 |
|
September 24, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE STATUS CONFERENCE 7 M/P Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
September 24, 2014 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 7EFM 7EFM Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
July 23, 2014 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 7 2:30PM NOI 7/24/14 Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
July 23, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 7EFM 9:30AM Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #001, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on June |
|
June 04, 2014 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 7 11:00AM PER ORDER 2/4/14 Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
June 04, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 7EFM 2:30PM Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
April 16, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 7EFM 9:30AM Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
February 25, 2014 | hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (60 CENTRE) (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR ARG Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law In Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and for Sa |
|
February 20, 2014 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affidavit in Opposition |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Exhibit D |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Exhibit C |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Exhibit B |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Exhibit A |
|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on February |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Affirmation of David A. Wolf in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the Defendant's Counterclai |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims and for Sanc |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims and for Sanctions |
|
February 04, 2014 | Motion |
PREL INJUNCTION/TEMP REST ORDR (Motion #001) Decided: 02/04/2014SEE DECISION Before Justice: WOOTEN, PAUL Answer demanded: No Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
February 04, 2014 | Motion |
DISMISS (Motion #002) Decided: 03/02/2015SEE DECISION Before Justice: WOOTEN, PAUL Answer demanded: No Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
February 04, 2014 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 7EFM 7EFM Judge: WOOTEN, PAUL |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-E (Motion #002) Exhibits A - E to Affirmation of David A. Wolf |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Memorandum Of Law |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 29 |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service for Order, RJI, Memo of Law and Application for TRO (by fedex) | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service for Order, RJI, Memo of Law and Application for TRO (by hand) | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service for Summons and Verified Complaint | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Re: Affirmation in Opposition |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter from David A. Wolf to Hon. Barbara R\. Kapnick |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 13, 201 |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law In Support Of Motion |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (Motion #001) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Anton Sanko |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Emergency Affirmation |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed OTSC |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |