Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Boris Borsky, Boss International United Trading Corp., Boss Limousine Inc., Zoya Borsky, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Griffin, Timothy G, Schwartz, Matthew F, against Davel Chauffeured Transportation Network, Dav-El Reservations System, Inc., Dav-El Services, Inc., Scott A Solombrino, represented by Ciampi, Maria L, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Eileen Bransten presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1018 days |
Answer
Date: December 14, 2007So Ordered Stipulation
Date: May 02, 2008STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 26, 2009STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE
Date: September 15, 2010DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: September 17, 2010So Ordered Stipulation
Date: September 22, 2009Letter / Correspondence
Date: December 11, 2007So Ordered Stipulation
Date: July 08, 2009So Ordered Stipulation
Date: November 26, 2008So Ordered Stipulation
Date: September 19, 2008Reply Affidavit or Affirmation (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2009Order to Show Cause (Motion #005)
Date: June 22, 2009Reply to Counterclaim
Date: March 06, 2009Reply to Counterclaim
Date: March 06, 2009AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2008So Ordered Stipulation
Date: July 03, 2008Amended Complaint
Date: December 14, 2007STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 14, 2007Memorandum Of Law In Reply (Motion #001)
Date: December 13, 2007MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: December 13, 2007Memorandum Of Law In Support (Motion #001)
Date: December 13, 2007Affidavit or Affirmation in Support of Motion (Motion #001)
Date: December 12, 2007NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 12, 2007Letter / Correspondence
Date: December 11, 2007So Ordered Stipulation
Date: December 07, 2007Summons + Complaint
Date: December 04, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005) entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 17, 2010 |
|
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 15, 2010 | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 22, 2009 | |
July 08, 2009 | Docket Event | SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 08, 2009 | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #005) | |
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Motion #005) Proof of Service |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply Affidavit or Affirmation (Motion #005) Reply Affirmation in Further Support of Motion to Compel Production |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Motion #005) Proof of Service |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Motion #005) Order to Show Cause and Exhibits |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | SIGNED DECISION entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 18, 2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.